skip to content

McGillivray, Cameron John

CPSO#: 90163

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. McGillivray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: South Health Campus 4448 Front Street Southeast Calgary, AB T3M 1M4
Date Received: 29 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015