skip to content

McGee, Heather

CPSO#: 100403

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richmond Medical Clinic
2-6265 Perth St
Richmond ON  K0A 2Z0
Phone: (613) 838-1223
Fax: (613) 838-2152 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER MCGEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2015