McGarry, Patrick John (CPSO#: 98543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Charlton Campus, Mary Grace Wing
Level 3
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-521-6188 Ext. ext 6
Fax: 905-521-1751
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK JOHN MCGARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGARRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016