McGarry, Jennifer Leigh (CPSO#: 100935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: Burgess, Jennifer Leigh (used until: 04 May 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primacy Clinic
1485 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury ON  P3A 5H7
Phone: (705) 222-7451
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

430 Notredame Ave
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K7
Canada
Phone: (705)671-9797
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

336 Pine St.
Sudbury ON  P3C 1X8
Canada
Phone: (705) 669-1617
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer L. McGarry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. McGarry ( CPSO# 100935)

Business Address:
Northwood Medical Clinics
1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jul 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEIGH MCGARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGARRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 31 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2018