skip to content

McFeely, Neil Hugh

CPSO#: 42291

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011