McFaul, Colleen Margaret (CPSO#: 97927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: Daly, Colleen Margaret (used until: 11 Sep 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anesthesia
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLLEEN MARGARET MCFAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFAUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2018