skip to content

McFarthing, Anthony Martin

CPSO#: 29416

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Durham, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Jan 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Jan 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2008