skip to content

McFadden, Erin Lindsay

CPSO#: 93089

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke Medical Centre FHT
85 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Erin McFadden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. McFadden ( CPSO# 93089 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke Medical Centre FHT
400-85 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone Number: (416) 621-2220

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN LINDSAY MCFADDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFADDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2012