skip to content

McEnery, Peter Joseph

CPSO#: 25616

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Aug 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Peter McEnery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 18 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Jun 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: August 8, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Joseph McEnery to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 8, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. McEnery engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. McEnery resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)