skip to content

McDonald, Donald John

CPSO#: 17860

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jun 1961

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Contact above
Records Management Limited
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
emial: [email protected]
Date Received: 22 Jan 2015


Instructions/Address:

Records Management Limited
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON  M9L 0A3

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 05 Nov 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:02 Dec 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Dec 2014