skip to content

McDonald, Charles Robert Joey

CPSO#: 86479

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Bell Farm Road
Unit 1
Barrie ON  L4M 5G6
Phone: 7057288778
Fax: 7057283053 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joey McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McDonald ( CPSO# 86479 )

Business Address:
170 Colbourne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
50 Alliance Boulevard
Barrie ON  L4M 5K3
Phone Number: (705) 728-8778

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
60 Bell Farm Road
Unit 1
Barrie ON  L4M 5G6
Phone Number: 7057288778

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective:30 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHARLES ROBERT JOEY MCDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012