skip to content

McCreery, Greig Lyon

CPSO#: 96067

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4506 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Canada
Phone: (519) 376-2121
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

250 10th St E
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1S4
Canada
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: McCreery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. G. McCreery ( CPSO# 96067 )

Business Address:
250 10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1S4

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4506

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3269

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M0
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GREIG LYON MCCREERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCREERY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016