skip to content

McCrea, Kristin Elizabeth

CPSO#: 98709

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jan 2014