skip to content

McConnell, Harriet Dianne

CPSO#: 29814

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jan 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Clinic for Person-Centred
Psychotherapy
Unit A201
2040 Sheppard Ave.E,
North York ON  M2J 5B3
Phone: (416) 229-2399 Ext. 282
Fax: (416) 229-9771 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARRIET DIANNE MCCONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCONNELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Feb 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1985