skip to content

McClure, Douglas Lloyd

CPSO#: 31327

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1984

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 792-7323
Fax: (905) 792-1316 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

324 Guelph St unit 2
Georgetown ON  L7G 4B5
Canada
Phone: (905) 792-7323
Fax: (905) 792-1316
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Douglas McClure Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. McClure ( CPSO# 31327 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 792-7323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 15 Sep 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS LLOYD MCCLURE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLURE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1984