skip to content

McCloy III, Robert Andrew

CPSO#: 93902

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
600 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7H8
Phone: 2894795540
Fax: 9059845566 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert McCloy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 13 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:31 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT ANDREW MCCLOY III may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCLOY III is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Jan 2017
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015