skip to content

McCleary, Paul Henry

CPSO#: 21655

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Sep 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Collingwood General Marine Hospital, 459 Hume Street, Collingwood, ON L9Y 1W9
Date Received: 30 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:23 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019