skip to content

McCausland, Joan

CPSO#: 20965

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994