skip to content

McCarty, Heather Anne

CPSO#: 89697

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 12 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010