skip to content

McCann, William Gerald

CPSO#: 27655

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. W.G. McCann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital 75 Ann Street Bracebridge, Ontario P1L 2E4 Canada
Date Received: 03 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 May 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2020