skip to content

McCann, Thomas Joseph

CPSO#: 22997

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T.J. McCann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can contact Docudavit Medical Solutions at: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 17 Sep 2019


Address: Bronte Medical Group 78 Jones Street Oakville ON L6L 6C5
Date Received: 26 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016