skip to content

McCallum, Catherine Lea

CPSO#: 29139

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
04 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1991

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2021