skip to content

McCallum, Andrew Lemay

CPSO#: 32709

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5310 Explorer Drive
Mississauga ON  L4W 5H8
Phone: (647) 428-2368
Fax: (647) 428-2022 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Annette McCallum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McCallum ( CPSO# 32709 )
Dr. A. McCallum ( CPSO# 63659 )

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW LEMAY MCCALLUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCALLUM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1981