skip to content

McCall, Simon O'Donnell

CPSO#: 26914

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Richard McCall 517 McGill Private Hawkesbury ON K6A 1R1
Date Received: 17 Apr 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.