skip to content

McCabe, Philip Charles

CPSO#: 29005

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
102-745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6
Phone: 51927459754
Fax: 2266668966 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Philip C. McCabe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking access to their medical record can contact: Southwest Ontario Aboriginal Health Centre, 425-427 William Street, London ON N6B 3E1, Tel: 519-672-4079.
Date Received: 26 Nov 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP CHARLES MCCABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCABE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2021