skip to content

McBride, John Aloysius

CPSO#: 41297

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Mar 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1985
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2000
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.