skip to content

McAvoy, Allen Vincent

CPSO#: 13121

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Apr 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Apr 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 27-Aug-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1950
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1998
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Apr 2002