skip to content

McAlister, Neil Harding

CPSO#: 28603

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Feb 2021
EXPIRY DATE
04 Feb 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: McAlister Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 4 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: 2202 Jane Street North York, ON M3M 1A4 416 614 7999
Instructions: Contact former practice above
Date Received: 02 Oct 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Feb 2021