skip to content

McAlister, Nazlin Kassam

CPSO#: 30972

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: McAlister Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. McAlister ( CPSO# 30972 )
Dr. N. McAlister ( CPSO# 28603 )

Business Address:
2202 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3M 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 614-7999

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. J. Aloysius East Whitby Medical Clinic 6 - 1916 Dundas St E Whitby ON L1N 2L6
Date Received: 21 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAZLIN KASSAM MCALISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCALISTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1979