skip to content

McAlister, Chloe Clicquot

CPSO#: 88970

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 504
960 Lawrence Ave W
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 782-2616
Fax: (416) 782-5899 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

40 Holly Street, Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4S3C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 486-8088
Fax: (416) 486-7888
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave W
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Chloe C. McAlister Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McAlister ( CPSO# 88970 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of General Surgery
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (647) 239-9205

Business Address:
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
Suite 504
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 782-2616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:28 Feb 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHLOE CLICQUOT MCALISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCALISTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2013