skip to content

Mc Quillan, Rory Francis

CPSO#: 91567

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 17 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mc Quillan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 12 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2020