skip to content

Mc Mahon, Cathy Ann

CPSO#: 92390

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 10 Feb 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2010 to 27 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Dec 2010
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.