skip to content

Mc Auliffe, Niamh Ann

CPSO#: 92340

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James O'Leary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: St Michaels Hospital 30 Bond St Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 16 Apr 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:26 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 24 Feb 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 25 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Sep 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 15 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 2019