skip to content

Mbuva, Regina Ndunge

CPSO#: 95007

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 May 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Kaamba, Swahili, Zulu

Education:University of Nairobi, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Regina Mbuva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mbuva ( CPSO# 95007 )

Business Address:
2 Janet Street South
Teeswater ON  N0G 2S0
Phone Number: (519) 392-6813


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REGINA NDUNGE MBUVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MBUVA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2011