Mazzuca, Monique Marie (CPSO#: 91960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2019

Expiry Date:  12 Jan 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Feb 2019

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Health Centre of Maple
2810 Major Mackenzie Dr W
Maple ON  L6A 1R8
Phone: (905) 832-3838
Fax: (905) 832-2359
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

One Health Family Practice
300 Rossland St
Ajax ON  L1Z 0K4
Canada
Phone: (905) 239-0663
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Monique M. Mazzuca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mazzuca ( CPSO# 91960 )

Business Address:
The Health Centre of Maple
2810 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 832-3838

Business Address:
One Health Family Practice
300 Rossland Road East
Maple ON  L1Z 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 239-7663

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Feb 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2009 to 04 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Aug 2010 to 04 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 12 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Feb 2019 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Monique  Marie  Mazzuca  may  practise family medicine at the Health
                  Centre of Maple in Maple, Ontario, and  One  Health  Family  Practice and
                  Walk-In  in Ajax, Ontario, while under the supervision coordinated  by  a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically  expires  on January 12,
                  2020.  

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the  following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Mazzuca's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required  reports  to  the  College  by  the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Mazzuca's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on February 6, 2019, and  will  expire  on  or
                  before January 12, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.