skip to content

Mazza, Jorge Alberto

CPSO#: 30964

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Joseph's Hospital 268 Grosvenor St London, ON N6A 4V2
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018