skip to content

Mazurski, Karen Lavenia

CPSO#: 33431

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: Macleod, Karen Lavenia (used until: 26 Jul 1982 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dingwall Medical Group
40 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone: (807) 223-2258
Fax: (807) 223-4733 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Karen Mazurski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mazurski ( CPSO# 33431 )

Business Address:
Dryden Regional Health Centre
40 Goodall Street
Box 3011
Dryden ON  P8N 2V8
Phone Number: (807) 223-2258

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN LAVENIA MAZURSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZURSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1982