skip to content

Mazurka, Robert Andrew

CPSO#: 28406

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert A Mazurka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mazurka ( CPSO# 28406 )

Business Address:
Anaesthesia Associates
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
60 Bridgeport Road East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2J9
Phone Number: (519) 664-3068

Medical Records Location

Address: 108 Glasgow Street North Conestogo ON N0B 1N0
Date Received: 24 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019