skip to content

Mazhar, Danish

CPSO#: 89726

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Amherstburg Family Health Team
Unit 101
721 Front Road South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 2M4
Phone: (519) 736-7770
Fax: (519) 736-7702 Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANISH MAZHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZHAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012