skip to content

Mazengia, Getachew Demem

CPSO#: 90248

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Mar 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:Jimma University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1039 Upper James St
Hamilton ON  L9C 3A6
Canada
Phone: 2896395613
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON  L4X 2V3
Canada
Phone: 18883502323
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. G. Mazengia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mazengia ( CPSO# 90248 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GETACHEW DEMEM MAZENGIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZENGIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Mar 2009 to 23 May 2009
AVP - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 24 May 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2011 to 08 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2021

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 18, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board by the complainant.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 27, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Please note that this matter has been appealed to HPARB by the subject physician.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)