skip to content

Maze, Ronnen

CPSO#: 91271

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Junction Road
Toronto ON  M6N 1B5
Phone: 416-766-1162
Fax: 416-766-0463 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maze Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Maze ( CPSO# 91271 )
Dr. D. Maze ( CPSO# 84116 )

Business Address:
96 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 2K8
Phone Number: (647) 748-4897

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RONNEN MAZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2014