skip to content

Mazarova, Andrea

CPSO#: 93473

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
CF - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 19 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2014