skip to content

Mayrand, Kerry Elise

CPSO#: 97818

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Windsor
Student Health Services
Windsor ON  N9B 3P4
Phone: (519) 973-7002
Fax: (519) 971-3637 Electoral District: 01

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record can contact Docudavit at: 1-888-781-9083.
Date Received: 20 Jul 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Feb 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KERRY ELISE MAYRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYRAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2015