skip to content

Mayo, Karli Laura

CPSO#: 93611

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 505
3200 Dufferin St
Toronto ON  M6A 3B2
Phone: (416) 2878080
Fax: (416) 2873593 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Karli Mayo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mayo ( CPSO# 93611 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
Suite 417
2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 282-4242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KARLI LAURA MAYO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015