skip to content

Maynes, Jason Thomas

CPSO#: 96608

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
and Pain Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5934 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Missouri

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:19 Jul 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Apr 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2019 Active
             Dr. Jason Thomas Maynes may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.