skip to content

Maxwell, Ian Edwin Johnson

CPSO#: 96146

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit M10 15 Elizabeth Street Orangeville ON L9W 3X3
Date Received: 24 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2016