skip to content

Maxwell, Brian Edward

CPSO#: 20499

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jan 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: For Toronto paitents: Unit 403 265 Yorkland Blvd Toronto ON M2J 1S5 For London paitents: 499 Oxford St E London ON N5Y 3H8
Date Received: 25 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2018