skip to content

Maxted, John Malcolm

CPSO#: 28068

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2022
EXPIRY DATE
02 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. JM Maxted Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 3 2022
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Health for All Family Health Team, 379 Church Street, Suite 202, Markham, Ontario, L6B 0T1 where they can be accessed by Dr. Zahir Khan with the consent of my former patients for continuing care.
Date Received: 29 Jun 2022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2022