skip to content

Mawhinney, Leah Anne

CPSO#: 90837

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: 519-672-3020
Fax: 5196726090 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LEAH ANNE MAWHINNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAWHINNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011