skip to content

Sestier, Maude

CPSO#: 133341

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main St W
Faculty of Health sciences
MDCL 3101A
Hamilton ON  L8S 4M1 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences (Administrative Office) Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:15 Sep 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAUDE SESTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SESTIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2021